U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01121
  • Case Name: SULTAN et al v. TRUMP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • May 01, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 01, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 26, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 26, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 26, 2025: [Expedite]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 24, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 24, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 23, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • April 22, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • April 19, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 18, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 16, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.