U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01124
  • Case Name: DOE 1 et al v. EEOC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 01, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • May 01, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • May 01, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 18, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym]
  • April 15, 2025: [Errata]
  • April 15, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 15, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 15, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.