U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01130
  • Case Name: DOGAN v. NOEM
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 19, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 18, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 15, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • April 15, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.