U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01138
  • Case Name: TENET HEALTHCARE CORPORATION v. SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 18, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 17, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • April 17, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 16, 2025: [Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.