U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-02535
  • Case Name: PATEL v. GEORGETOWN SOFTWARE HOUSE, INC.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 06, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • May 02, 2025: [.Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Pre-motion Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Mediation (Circuit Executive's Office)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Standing Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.