U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01151
  • Case Name: ALI et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 24, 2025: [1 - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • April 24, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [1 - Terminate Trial Management Order Deadlines]
  • April 23, 2025: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • April 23, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • April 22, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 20, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 17, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • April 16, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • April 16, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 16, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.