U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01141
  • Case Name: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 29, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 24, 2025: [Supplemental Memorandum]
  • April 24, 2025: [Discovery]
  • April 22, 2025: [Report Regarding Copyright]
  • April 17, 2025: [Standing Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • April 17, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.