U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01162
  • Case Name: ALTER v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF GOVERNMENT EFFICIENCY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 03, 2025: [.Order]
  • May 03, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • April 30, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • April 29, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for CM/ECF Password]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Summons Not Issued]
  • April 17, 2025: [CM/ECF Password]
  • April 17, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.