U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01165
  • Case Name: Kaplan et al v. Genworth Life Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents]
  • April 21, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice to Counsel/Party]
  • April 21, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 18, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 18, 2025: [Civil Cover Sheet (USE ONLY IF INSTRUCTED)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 17, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • April 17, 2025: [Errata]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.