U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01175
  • Case Name: NAGARAPU v. STUDENT AND EXCHANGE VISITOR PROGRAM et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • April 28, 2025: [Supplemental Memorandum]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 21, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 20, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • April 20, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 20, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 20, 2025: [Hold in Abeyance]
  • April 20, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 18, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 17, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • April 17, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 17, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.