U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01188
  • Case Name: BRANDON v. OUTPOST 24, INC. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 28, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 25, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • April 25, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 22, 2025: [Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice to Counsel/Party]
  • April 18, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.