U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01196
  • Case Name: DOE v. COLLINS
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 30, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 30, 2025: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • April 30, 2025: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 24, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 24, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
  • April 18, 2025: [.Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.