U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01203
  • Case Name: OZTURK et al v. NOEM
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 24, 2025: [1 - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • April 24, 2025: [1 - Terminate Trial Management Order Deadlines]
  • April 23, 2025: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • April 23, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 23, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 22, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 20, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 20, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 20, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 19, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 19, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 19, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • April 19, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.