U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01147
  • Case Name: OBUTE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Status Report]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 02, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • May 02, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • May 02, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 01, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • April 28, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone or Video]
  • April 25, 2025: [Appear by Telephone or Video]
  • April 24, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • April 24, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • April 23, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 23, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 23, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 22, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Expedite]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 22, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 21, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 20, 2025: [Status Report Order]
  • April 20, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 20, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 20, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 20, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.