U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01222
  • Case Name: ZHANG v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • April 28, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 27, 2025: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 25, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 24, 2025: [Status Report Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 22, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 21, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.