U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01248
  • Case Name: LEARNING RESOURCES, INC. et al v. TRUMP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 30, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 30, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Scheduling Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 25, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 25, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 24, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 24, 2025: [Transfer Case]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 23, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 22, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.