U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01249
  • Case Name: LOGAN TAX SERVICES LLC v. 112 V STREET NE TRUST et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 24, 2025: [Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice to Counsel/Party]
  • April 23, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.