U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01206
  • Case Name: KHADEMI v. NOEM et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Status Report Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • April 28, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 25, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • April 23, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 23, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.