Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:18-cr-00365-2
    Party Name:USA v. HONCHAROVA
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Offense]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement Hearing]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Referred for PSI Report]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Standing Order]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Protective Order]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Defendant Committed]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Protective Order ]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [.Order]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave to File Document ]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
    Date Published:January 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?202623
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =