Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00012-1
    Party Name:USA v. YARBROUGH
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Offense]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement Hearing]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Referred for PSI Report]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [.Order]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Routine Processing]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Routine Processing]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Routine Processing]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Disclosure ]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:January 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Summons Returned Executed ]
    Date Published:January 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Protective Order ]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?203309
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =