Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Columbia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:19-00031-
    Party Name:Michael K Wilkinson
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Certification About A Financial Management Course (Original or Amended)]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Record of Any Interest in Sect. 521(c) Acct or Program (Original or Amended)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Statement of Intent (Original or Amended)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2 (Original or Amended)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Schedules A/B-J]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Service - Ntc of Requirement to File Stmt of Completion of Mgmt Course]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to File Required Documents]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Order to File Required Documents]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
    Date Published:January 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.dcb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?47326
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =