open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00036-1
    Party Name:USA v. EGO
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:June 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum ]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Recommendation of PSI Report]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Indictment]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Offense]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement Hearing]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Referred for PSI Report]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?204019
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =