open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:19-cv-01412
    Party Name:HUNT v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt and Acknowledgment of Transfer Papers]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Transferred Out]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [EMAIL MDL]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Related Case]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?207256
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =