open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:19-cv-01409
    Party Name:LEVI & KORSINSKY, LLP v. UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [.Order]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:July 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Summons to Issue]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?207250
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =