open-public-records

U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:19-mj-00212-1
    Party Name:USA v. AN
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Continue ]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Status Conference]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Continue ]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Control Hearing]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:October 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance - Rule 5]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:[~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearings]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Case Unsealed]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Arrest - Rule 5]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?210224
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =