open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:19-cv-02713
    Party Name:FIRST CHOICE MASONRY v. MOSELEY CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Create Case Association]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [.Order]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to opposition to motion]
    Date Published:November 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to motion]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:October 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consolidate Cases]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Standing Order]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Related Case]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?210976
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =