open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:19-cv-02711
    Party Name:CANEPA v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Report]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [.Order]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?210975
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =