open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:19-cv-03643
    Party Name:SHROFF et al v. CUCCINELLI
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:March 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
    Date Published:March 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Errata]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of QC]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to motion]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal/Party]
    Date Published:March 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transfer Case]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?213404
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =