open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:19-cv-03625
    Party Name:BETTIS v. BOWSER et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to opposition to motion]
    Date Published:July 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:July 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:July 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Order of the Court]
    Date Published:July 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to motion]
    Date Published:July 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:June 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:June 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Reissued]
    Date Published:May 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:April 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:April 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplemental Memorandum]
    Date Published:April 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Reissued]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Summons to Issue]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [.Order]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Errata]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued as to DCAG,DCDFT, Mayor]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?213401
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =