open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:19-cv-03641
    Party Name:ASKARZADEH v. BARR et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [.Order]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
    Date Published:December 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
    Date Published:December 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition for Writ of Mandamus]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?213400
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =