open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:19-cv-03646
    Party Name:FAIDHALLA v. US DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [.Order]
    Date Published:June 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?213411
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =