open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:20-cv-00444
    Party Name:GENSCH v. ALEXANDER GRAHAM BELL ASSOCIATION FOR THE DEAF AND HARD OF HEARING et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [.Order]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Counsel/Party]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?215332
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =