open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:20-cv-01773
    Party Name:HEIDI AVIATION, LLC v. JETCRAFT CORPORATION et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:July 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:July 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents]
    Date Published:July 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:July 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [.Order]
    Date Published:July 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:July 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Counsel/Party]
    Date Published:July 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?219530
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =