open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:20-cv-02154
    Party Name:CONTRERAS v. BUSBOYS, INC. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:September 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:September 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:August 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:August 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:August 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Meet and Confer Statement]
    Date Published:August 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents]
    Date Published:August 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:August 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [.Order]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Counsel/Party]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Errata]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Payment of Fee - Complaint]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?220782
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =