open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:20-cr-00193-1
    Party Name:USA v. FRYDAY
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:October 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:October 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:October 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:October 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:October 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
    Date Published:October 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
    Date Published:October 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
    Date Published:October 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:October 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:October 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:October 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:October 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:October 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Speedy Trial ]
    Date Published:October 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release from Custody ]
    Date Published:October 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
    Date Published:October 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest ]
    Date Published:October 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:October 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [.Order]
    Date Published:October 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Protective Order]
    Date Published:October 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:October 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:October 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
    Date Published:October 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
    Date Published:October 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Protective Order ]
    Date Published:October 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Disclosure ]
    Date Published:October 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:September 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add Counts]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?222162
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =