open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:20-cv-02623
    Party Name:HARTI v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:October 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
    Date Published:October 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
    Date Published:October 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
    Date Published:October 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Standing Order]
    Date Published:October 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?222159
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =