U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00359-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ROCHE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Status Report]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 08, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 07, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Status Report]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 08, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 20, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 24, 2021: [Exclude]
  • June 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • June 20, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 16, 2021: [Protective Order ]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • May 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 03, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 03, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • May 03, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • May 03, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 29, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • April 22, 2021: [.Order]
  • April 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 20, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • April 19, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 19, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.