U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00383-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TIMBROOK
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • May 14, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • April 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 27, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 27, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 27, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • April 27, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 27, 2021: [.Order]
  • April 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 21, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • April 20, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 20, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.