U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00375-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ANTONIO
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 08, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 08, 2021: [Exclude]
May, 2021
  • May 29, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 17, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • May 10, 2021: [Transcript]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [.Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • April 22, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 22, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.