U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00374-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CHRISTENSEN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • July 08, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 22, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 18, 2021: [Exclude]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 04, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 04, 2021: [.Order]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • May 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 04, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • May 04, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 04, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • May 04, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • May 04, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.