U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00048
  • Case Name: COMMODITY FUTURES TRADING COMMISSION v. FIRST STATE DEPOSITORY, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • December 16, 2022: [Attachment for Contempt quashed]
  • December 12, 2022: [.Order]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • November 09, 2022: [Reply to opposition to motion]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Status Report]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 10, 2022: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • August 09, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 05, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 04, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Status Report]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Status Report]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 26, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 25, 2022: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 07, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • April 06, 2022: [Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • March 22, 2022: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of QC]
  • March 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 09, 2022: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 04, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 03, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 01, 2022: [.Order]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • January 19, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 12, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 23, 2021: [Declaration]
  • November 23, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 15, 2021: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • November 08, 2021: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Show Cause]
  • October 22, 2021: [Contempt]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Enforce ]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 28, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 24, 2021: [Errata]
  • June 23, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • June 08, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • June 03, 2021: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [.Order]
  • May 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 26, 2021: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • May 26, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 12, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order to Show Cause]
  • May 11, 2021: [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 06, 2021: [.Order]
  • May 05, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 05, 2021: [Enforce]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.