U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00358-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SARKO
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • September 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 30, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • July 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 05, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 05, 2021: [Exclude]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 07, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 07, 2021: [Exclude]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Response to motion]
  • May 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 19, 2021: [.Order]
  • May 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 06, 2021: [Discovery]
  • May 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 05, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • May 05, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 05, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.