U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00406-1
  • Case Name: USA v. YAZDANI
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 25, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 25, 2021: [Exclude]
  • June 21, 2021: [Transcript]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 08, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 08, 2021: [Exclude]
May, 2021
  • May 31, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 05, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 05, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • May 05, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.