U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00403-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COPELAND
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • September 10, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 24, 2021: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • August 24, 2021: [Revoke]
  • August 20, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 20, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • August 18, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 13, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • July 01, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 01, 2021: [Exclude]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Psychiatric Report]
  • June 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • May 19, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 19, 2021: [.Order]
  • May 06, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 06, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • May 06, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.