U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00410-1
  • Case Name: USA v. NASSIF
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 10, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 10, 2021: [Exclude]
  • June 10, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 12, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • May 11, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • May 11, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 11, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.