U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00418-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WICKERSHAM
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order]
  • July 13, 2021: [Exclude]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 09, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 09, 2021: [Exclude]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • May 11, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 11, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • May 11, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.