U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00372-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CHAPMAN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 08, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • July 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 12, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 12, 2021: [Exclude]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Exclude]
  • May 13, 2021: [.Order]
  • May 12, 2021: [Vacate]
  • May 12, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 12, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.