U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00419-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ZLAB
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 19, 2021: [.Order]
  • May 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • May 14, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 14, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.