U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00424-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SELLS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • August 02, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 13, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 11, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 07, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • June 01, 2021: [Exclude]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • May 24, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • May 24, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 20, 2021: [.Order]
  • May 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 18, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • May 17, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 17, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • May 16, 2021: [Seal Case]
  • May 16, 2021: [Complaint (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.