U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00425-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PERSICK
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 11, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 11, 2021: [Exclude]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • May 17, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 17, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.